This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 16:45:06 (UTC).

RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES VS ACTIVE HOLDINGS

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACTIVE HOLDINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3060

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

CALIFORNIA PACKAGING

Defendants

ACTIVE HOLDINGS, LLC

BEDFORD VENTURES, INC.

APS GROUP, INC.

APPAREL PRODUCTIONSERVICES GLOBAL, LLC

BEDFORD VENTURES, INC

APPAREL PRODUCTION SERVICES GLOBAL, LLC

ACTIVE RIDE SHOP, LLC

APS GROUP, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN C PEARCY,APC

4072 Chestnut St., 2Nd Floor P.O. Box 1583

Riverside, CA 92501

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN C PEARCY, APC

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN C PEARCY, APC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration of BRIAN C PEARCY REGARDING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/21/2021: Declaration of BRIAN C PEARCY REGARDING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

10/18/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

11/09/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

Certificate of Mailing

11/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Document Return.

10/06/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

09/17/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

07/29/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Mailing

07/08/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/08/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Document Return.

07/06/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Declaration of Brian C Pearcy Regarding The Order to Show Cause

07/05/2021: Declaration of Brian C Pearcy Regarding The Order to Show Cause

Notice of Document Return.

07/02/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service

07/02/2021: Proof of Service

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

06/22/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110)

01/11/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

12/21/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

12/21/2020: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/25/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5743 Receipt No.: 20211025-00285.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/25/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5743 Receipt No.: 20211025-00283.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of BRIAN C PEARCY REGARDING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.; Filed By: RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.; Filed By: RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/17/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV200717-0277-V.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of RICHARD BARTON ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APPAREL PRODUCTIONSERVICES GLOBAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PACKAGING is a litigant

Latest cases where Active Holdings LLC is a litigant