This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 15:17:23 (UTC).

REYNOSO VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 REYNOSO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1010

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD REYNOSO

Defendant

CANDIDA TORRES

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JU

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGEMENT ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/27/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JU

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGEMENT ON CANDIDA TORRES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/27/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EDWARD REYNOSO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AS TO CANDIDA TORRES, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/27/16

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/14/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO CANDIDA TORRES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/14/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92585.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGEMENT ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/27/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGEMENT ON CANDIDA TORRES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/27/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY EDWARD REYNOSO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AS TO CANDIDA TORRES, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/27/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/14/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO CANDIDA TORRES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/14/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/15/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF EDWARD REYNOSO AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92585.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less