This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/14/2020 at 06:35:29 (UTC).

REYNA vs ABTTC INC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2014 REYNA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABTTC INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0534

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

ANA REYNA

BRANDI L REYNA

ESTATE OF SHAUN R REYNA

ESTATE OF SHAUN REYNA

BRANDON REYNA

ROBERTA J DUNN MD

UHS CORONA INC

KURT MUELLER M.D

Defendants and Appellants

ABTTC INC

FORTERUS HEALTH CARE SERVICES INC

AMERICAN ADDICTIONCENTERS INC

CORONA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ROBERTA J DUNN MD

BRANDON M REYNA

CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS MEDICAL GRO

JAMES STUART PA

CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS

UHS CORONA INC

KURT MUELLER M.D

JAMES STUART

Plaintiff and Minor

BRANDI L REYNA

Not Classified By Court

MCC1500001

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Minor Attorneys

THE ZUCKER LAW FIRM

43434 Business Park Drive

Temecula, CA 92590

GOMEZ TRIAL ATTORNEYS

655 W Broadway, Ste 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

LAFAVE & RICE

2333 1St Ave. Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92101

RIZIO & NELSON

1801 H Parkcourt Place

Santa Ana, CA 92701

RIZIO LAW FIRM

2677 N Main St, Ste 225

Santa Ana, CA 92705

RIZIO LAW FIRM PC

1801 H Parkcourt Place

Santa Ana, CA 92701

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD & STOCKALPER

1230 Rosecrans Ave. Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

THOMPSON & COLEGATE LLP

3610 Fourteenth Street P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92502

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

BEACH COWDREY JENKINS LLP

500 E Esplanade Drive Suite 1400

Oxnard, CA 93036

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD & STOCKALPER

1230 Rosecrans Ave. Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

THOMPSON & COLEGATE LLP

3610 Fourteenth Street P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92502

BEACH COWDREY OWENLLP

500 E Esplanade Dr, Ste 1400

Oxnard, CA 93036

BEACH COWDREY JENKINS LLP

500 E Esplanade Drive Suite 1400

Oxnard, CA 93036

WARFORD, ROBERT K

215 North "D" Street Suite 303

San Bernardino, CA 92401

DUMMIT, BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

101 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101-8122

THOMPSON & COLGATELLP

3610 Fourteenth Street P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92501

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLIC

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE; HONORABLE JUDGE ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ.

DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A LOWE

DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A LOWE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED

DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A LOWE

DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A LOWE IN SUPPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS BY ABTTC INC, FORTERUS HEALTH CARE SERVICES INC, AMERICAN ADDICTIONCENTERS INC FILED

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FOR ORD

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION BY ANA REYNA, BRANDI L REYNA, ESTATE OF SHAUN R REYNA FILED

DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A LOWE

DECLARATION OF JEREMIAH A LOWE FILED

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: #19 TO EX

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: #19 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OR THE INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE FILED BY ABTTC INC, FORTERUS HEALTH CARE SERVICES INC, AMERICAN ADDICTIONCENTERS INC.

REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN

REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #29 BY ABTTC INC, FORTERUS HEALTH CARE SERVICES INC, AMERICAN ADDICTIONCENTERS INC FILED

(AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

(AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS BENCH B

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS BENCH BRIEF RE: HEARSAY BY ABTTC INC, FORTERUS HEALTH CARE SERVICES INC, AMERICAN ADDICTIONCENTERS INC FILED.

OBJECTION TO CALLING MELINDA B

OBJECTION TO CALLING MELINDA BELEW OWEN ESQ AS WITNESS FILED BY ABTTC INC, FORTERUS HEALTH CARE SERVICES INC, AMERICAN ADDICTIONCENTERS INC

BENCH BRIEF RE: DEFENSE CALLIN

BENCH BRIEF RE: DEFENSE CALLING APEX WITNESS THAT THEY OBJ AND PRECLUDED PLTFF FROM DEPOSING

FILED: JURY REQUEST OR QUESTIO

FILED: JURY REQUEST OR QUESTION

JOINT OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR JU

JOINT OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITH- STANDING THE VERDICT BY PLAINTIFFS FILED

AMENDED JUDGMENT; HONORABLE JU

AMENDED JUDGMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE ANGEL M BERMUDEZ

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - APPEAL PACKET.

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY BY UHS CORONA INC FILED

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ANA REYNA BY ROBERTA J DUNN MD, KURT MUELLER M.D, CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, JAMES STUART PA REPRESENTED BY REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD &STOCKALPER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

690 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING APPEAL DISMISSED; JUSTICE RAMIREZ, NONE, NONE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL APPEAL DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL SERVE LETTER REGARDING SETTLEMENT STATUS OR DISMIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 12/31/19 UPDATED TO 3/30/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 8/30/19 UPDATED TO 12/31/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL MOT TO STRIKE VOL 2 OF APP APPENDIX/GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 3/29/19 UPDATED TO 8/30/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketTRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
1,482 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY ANA REYNA, BRANDI L REYNA, ESTATE OF SHAUN R REYNA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ANA REYNA, BRANDI L REYNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: APPLICATION FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM SUBMITTED BY BRANDI L REYNA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketCASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less