Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/27/2018 at 08:25:55 (UTC).

REYES VS SILVERA

Case Summary

On 08/05/2014 REYES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SILVERA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0171

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

GEORGE REYES

Beaumont, CA 92223

Defendants and Appellants

NAZARIO SILVERA

Banning, CA 92220

LINDA SILVERA

Banning, CA 92220

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (BANNING).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GEORGE REYES IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON NAZARIO SILVERA FILED

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON NAZARIO SILVERA FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 08/05/2014 OF GEORGE REYES SERVED ON NAZARIO SILVERA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON LINDA SILVERA FILED

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON LINDA SILVERA FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 08/05/2014 OF GEORGE REYES AS TO LINDA SILVERA, MAILING DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED. COSTS OF $65.00.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 08/05/2014 OF GEORGE REYES FILED BY NAZARIO SILVERA - BANNING.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: HE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF REYES VS SILVERA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF REYES VS SILVERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM BANNING COURT - BANNING.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL - BANNING SET 11/10/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 08/05/2014 OF GEORGE REYES FILED BY NAZARIO SILVERA - BANNING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 08/05/2014 OF GEORGE REYES AS TO LINDA SILVERA, MAILING DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED. COSTS OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON LINDA SILVERA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 08/05/2014 OF GEORGE REYES SERVED ON NAZARIO SILVERA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/14/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON NAZARIO SILVERA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SC COURT ON NAZARIO SILVERA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GEORGE REYES IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • FEE WAIVER FOR GEORGE REYES WAS GRANTED FOR SMALL CLAIMS; $75.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GEORGE REYES (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 9/08/14, AT 13:30, IN B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (BANNING).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT B1. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less