Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 11:25:31 (UTC).

REYES VS MCINTYRE

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 REYES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCINTYRE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0477

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIGIA REYES

Banning, CA 92220

Defendants

VERNICE WAYNE MCINTYRE

MEGAN R CASELMAN

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY LIGIA REYES IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF LIGIA REYES SERVED ON VERNICE WAYNE MCINTYRE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF LIGIA REYES SERVED ON MEGAN R CASELMAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/21/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF LIGIA REYES AS TO VERNICE WAYNE MCINTYRE, MEGAN R CASELMAN

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LIGIA REYES.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LIGIA REYES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF LIGIA REYES AS TO VERNICE WAYNE MCINTYRE, MEGAN R CASELMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/21/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF LIGIA REYES SERVED ON MEGAN R CASELMAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/07/2014 OF LIGIA REYES SERVED ON VERNICE WAYNE MCINTYRE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR LIGIA REYES TO BE RETURNED BY 05/09/14. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2014
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 5/09/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWBA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LIGIA REYES (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 7/09/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less