This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 07:09:03 (UTC).

REO PROPERTIES GROUP VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 REO PROPERTIES GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0353

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REO PROPERTIES GROUP

Defendants

JORGE RODRIGUEZ

Beaumont, CA 92223

BELEN RODRIGUEZ

Beaumont, CA 92223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER LAWGROUP,PLC

181 S Old Springs Rd 2Nd Floor

Anaheim Hills, CA 92809

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2018 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER/ASSIGNMENT.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2018 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP BY JORGE RODRIGUEZ, BELEN RODRIGUEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON DURINGER LAWGROUP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/24/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JORGE RODRIGUEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK E MUNSON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BELEN RODRIGUEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK E MUNSON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2018 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP SERVED ON BELEN RODRIGUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/15/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2018 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP SERVED ON JORGE RODRIGUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/15/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

NOTICE OF HEARING OF TRIAL FIL

NOTICE OF HEARING OF TRIAL FILED

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

DECLARATION OF CHARLES BRANHAM

DECLARATION OF CHARLES BRANHAM FILED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHARLES BRANHAM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OF TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2018 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP BY JORGE RODRIGUEZ, BELEN RODRIGUEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER/ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2018 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 2/11/19 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REO Properties Group Inc is a litigant