This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 06:44:49 (UTC).

REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4145

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC.

Defendant

CARMEN BERNAL HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER LAWGROUP,PLC

181 S Old Springs Rd 2Nd Floor

Anaheim Hills, CA 92809

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. AS TO CARMEN BERNAL HERNANDEZ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/09/20

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. AS TO CARMEN BERNAL HERNANDEZ

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC..

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/04/20

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketWRIT FEE PAID BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. AS TO CARMEN BERNAL HERNANDEZ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/09/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. AS TO CARMEN BERNAL HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/04/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP, INC. AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 2/19/20 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REO Properties Group Inc is a litigant