This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/24/2019 at 18:15:06 (UTC).

REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1178

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC

Defendant

OSCAR FRANCO GARCIA

Hemet, CA 92545

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER LAWGROUP,PLC

181 S Old Springs Rd 2Nd Floor

Anaheim Hills, CA 92809

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER SAMRA FURBUSH FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC AS TO OSCAR FRANCO GARCIA WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/12/19

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC AS TO OSCAR FRANCO GARCIA

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/02/19

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 08/02/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC AS TO OSCAR FRANCO GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC AS TO OSCAR FRANCO GARCIA WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER SAMRA FURBUSH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/23/19 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2019 OF REO PROPERTIES GROUP INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REO Properties Group Inc is a litigant