This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 15:05:20 (UTC).

RENTERIA VS ALBAS TRUCKING

Case Summary

On 05/23/2014 RENTERIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBAS TRUCKING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0771

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN RENTERIA

ANDREW RENTERIA

JESSICA RENTERIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ALBAS TRUCKING

311 N Palm Street

La Habra, CA 90631

ERNEST JIM MESTAS

NEW WEST REMODELERS BUILDERS DESIGNERS INC

MAMCO INC

ADVANCE MANAGEMENT& INVESTMENT LLC

DENNIS LORTON & ASSOCIATES INC

ALABBASI CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING

FAST 5 JACKSON 2 LLC

NEW WEST PROPERTIES DEVELOPMENT COMPANY,INC

HEAVY CARGO INC

BURRELL CO ENTERPRISES INC

ALABBASI GROUP INC

DANNY BURRELL

DENNIS LORTON & ASSOCIATES, INC

LUIS ALBA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MAMCO INC

ADVANCE MANAGEMENT& INVESTMENT LLC

BURRELL CO ENTERPRISES INC

DENNIS LORTON & ASSOCIATES, INC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AITKEN AITKEN & COHN

3 Macarthur Place P.O. Box 2555

Santa Ana, CA 92707-0555

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF FRANK T. SABAITIS

730 S. El Molino Ave.

Pasadena, CA 91106

YEE & ASSOCIATES

3452 East Foothill Blvd Suite 1000

Pasadena, CA 91107

CHRISTENSEN EHRET LLP

1629 Cravens Avenue

Torrance, CA 90501

THOMPSON & COLEGATE LLP

3610 Fourteenth Street P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92502

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont #300

Irvine, CA 92612

LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK J MCDONOUGH

P O Box 51457 3633 E Inland Empire Bvd #450

Ontario, CA 91764

HAWKINS, MARC W

750 North Diamond Bar Blvd Suite#222

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

BRADLEY & GMELICH

700 North Brand Blvd 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF RICHARD A COHN

DECLARATION OF RICHARD A COHN RE: PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY FOR ANDREW MICHASEL RENTERIA FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/23/2016 OF ADVANCE MANAGEMENT& INVESTMENTLLC SERVED ON DENNIS LORTON & ASSOCIATES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/29/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2014 OF JOHN RENTERIA BY HEAVY CARGO INC REPRESENTED BY MARC W HAWKINS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SET

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: C

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/23/2016 OF ADVANCE MANAGEMENT& INVESTMENTLLC NAMING ROES/MOES 05 TO BE ALBAS TRUCKING FILED

REPLY TO OWN MOTION FOR DETERM

REPLY TO OWN MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEM BY MAMCO INC FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT BY ERNEST JIM MESTAS FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY JOHN RENTERIA, ANDREW RENTERIA, JESSICA RENTERIA FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH FILED

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS ADDITIO

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS ADDITIONAL FACTS BY BURRELL CO ENTERPRISES INC FILED.

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE S

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT BY BURRELL CO ENTERPRISES INC FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/19/2017 OF DENNIS LORTON & ASSOCIATES, INC FILED.

MINUTE ORDER: RULING AS TO THE

MINUTE ORDER: RULING AS TO THE 12/29/17 EX PARTE HEARING

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JOHN RENTERIA, ANDREW RENTERIA, JESSICA RENTERIA.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2014 OF JOHN RENTERIA AS TO FAST 5 JACKSON 2 LLC FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN RENTERIA

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE: RETURN OF LODGED TRANSCRIPTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RETURN OF LODGED TRANSCRIPTS (LORTON, ALBA, ALBA JR., BURRELL, HESS, STICKELMAN; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO TOWARD MAXIUM INDEPENDENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO CHAPARRAL HIGH SCHOOL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO INLAND REGIONAL CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO TEMECULA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC HEARING ON 6/28/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
459 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JOHN RENTERIA, ANDREW RENTERIA, JESSICA RENTERIA FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2014 OF JOHN RENTERIA SERVED ON ERNEST JIM MESTAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/01/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/23/2014 OF JOHN RENTERIA AS TO ALBAS TRUCKING; MAILING DATE OF 07/23/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less