This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 23:27:58 (UTC).

MONTES VS AMERISOURCEBERGEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2015 MONTES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMERISOURCEBERGEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0970

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES Jr

Claimant

LAWRENCE M KNAPP

Defendants and Cross Defendants

RAFAEL SANCHEZ

4 SAME DAY TRANSPORTATION

RR DONNELLEY & SONS CO

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION

SUBCONTRACTING CONCEPTS LLC

25 Willowbrook Rd

Queensbury, NY 12804

WEST COAST EXPRESS

4592 Enrico Way

Riverside, CA 92501

WEST COAST XPRESS

4SAMEDAY TRANSPORTATION LTD

ROES 1 THROUGH 10

SCI

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

4 SAME DAY TRANSPORTATION

RR DONNELLEY & SONS CO

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION

Interested Party

THERESA CHACON

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

KABATECK BROWN KELLNER LLP

644 S Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Claimant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE MKNAPP

250 Dorris Place

Stockton, CA 95204

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY J HOGAN

2101 Corporate Center Drive Suite 150

Newbury Park, CA 91320

NUSSBAUM DIMOND LLP

27489 Agoura Rd Ste 102

Aguora Hills, CA 91301

LAW OFFICES OF JOEL GLASER APC

11300 West Olympic Blvd Suite 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

GIBSON & HUGHES

1551 N. Tustin Avenue Suite 530

Santa Ana, CA 92705

CLINTON & CLINTON

100 Oceangate 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGARD & SMITH

633 West 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SUBCONTRACTING CONCEPTS LLC

25 Willowbrook Rd

Queensbury, NY 12804

LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES C WELLER APC

11412 Corley Court

San Diego, CA 92126

THE LAW OFFICES OFPETER FIDOPIASTIS

25 Willowbrook Road 2Nd Floor

Queensbury, NY 12804

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RAYMOND MONTES REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES C WELLERAPC FOR PARTY(S) WEST COAST EXPRESS AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY R

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

COURT'S RULING ON MOTION FOR L

COURT'S RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT DATED 11/15/17.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/15/17.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2015 OF RAYMOND MONTES BY AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY CLINTON & CLINTON FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/10/2015 OF AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION NAMING DOES 02 TO BE WEST COAST EXPRESS FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR SUBSTITUTE THERE

MOTION TO/FOR SUBSTITUTE THERESA CHACON AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM WITH REAL PARTY IN INTEREST RAYMOND MONTES JR BY RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2015 OF RAYMOND MONTES SERVED ON RR DONNELLEY & SONSCO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/01/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2015 OF RAYMOND MONTES NAMING DOES 005 TO BE SUBCONTRACTING CONCEPTS LLC FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR LEAVE TO

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG / RR DONNELLEY FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2015 OF RAYMOND MONTES AS TO WEST COAST EXPRESS FILED.

REPLY TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO A

REPLY TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR FILED

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RAYMO

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RAYMOND MONTES FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIKE PO

OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLA AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KABATECK BROWN KELLNER LLP FILED

REPLY TO IN SUPP OF HIS MTN FO

REPLY TO IN SUPP OF HIS MTN FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING DEF CHALLENGE BY RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR FILED

REPLY TO MTN FOR TRIAL PREFERE

REPLY TO MTN FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PUR CCP36E BY RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNS

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL BY 4 SAME DAY TRANSPORTATION FILED.

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO 3/29/19 JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • JT CALENDARED ON 03/29/19 IN DEPT. PS1. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 03/29/19 IN DEPT. 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RAYMOND MONTES REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY J HOGAN FOR PARTY(S) RAFAEL SANCHEZ AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY NUSSBAUM DIMOND LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET 2/28/19 AT 10:30 IN 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
362 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2015 OF RAYMOND MONTES BY RAFAEL SANCHEZ REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY J HOGAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/26/2015 OF RAYMOND MONTES BY AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY CLINTON & CLINTON FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY CLINTON & CLINTON FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR NAMED AS THERESA CHACON IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • FAX FILING BY RAYMOND ANTHONY MONTES JR ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less