This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2021 at 22:06:48 (UTC).

RANDALL vs RUBIO

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 RANDALL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUBIO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0851

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOAN RANDALL

ALBERT RANDALL

Defendants

RAMON RUBIO

MIRIAM NAVARRETE

COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES

THE MENTOR NETWORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAKE LAW FIRM

Attorney at DRAKE LAW FIRM

19935 Ventura Blvd, Ste 202

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Defendant Attorneys

STRATMAN SCHWARTZ & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

Attorney at STRATMAN SCHWARTZ & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

560 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 460

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Julia Vohl Islas

Christopher A. McIntire

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Ex Parte Application re: on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

08/06/2021: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Ex Parte Application re: on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation to Continue Trial Order

06/28/2021: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation to Continue Trial Order

Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Cole Vocational Services dba The Mentor Network (Doe 1) on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

04/13/2021: Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Cole Vocational Services dba The Mentor Network (Doe 1) on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

Response to Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

03/05/2021: Response to Notice of Court Ordered Mediation

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Plaintiff's ADR as to DRAKE LAW FIRM

03/10/2021: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Plaintiff's ADR as to DRAKE LAW FIRM

TRIAL SETTING ORDER

11/30/2020: TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

11/12/2020: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

08/03/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Case Management Statement filed by RAMON RUBIO, MIRIAM NAVARRETE

07/17/2020: Case Management Statement filed by RAMON RUBIO, MIRIAM NAVARRETE

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED

07/17/2020: DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED

Notice of 1st Appearance Fees Posted by RAMON RUBIO, MIRIAM NAVARRETE filed.

06/16/2020: Notice of 1st Appearance Fees Posted by RAMON RUBIO, MIRIAM NAVARRETE filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint of RANDALL served on RAMON RUBIO with service date of 03/08/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

03/12/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of RANDALL served on RAMON RUBIO with service date of 03/08/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

02/25/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingType: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Continue Trial; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingType: Ex Parte Application for an Order to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Ex Parte Application for an Order to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/06/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210806-00317.1; Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Ex Parte Application re: on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application for an Order to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL; Filed By: COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of RANDALL by RAMON RUBIO, MIRIAM NAVARRETE represented by HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: RAMON RUBIO; MIRIAM NAVARRETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of RANDALL as to MIRIAM NAVARRETE; mailing date of 03/10/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of RANDALL served on RAMON RUBIO with service date of 03/08/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/25/2020; Fine Description: Check #8519 Receipt No.: CV200225-0555-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assginment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of RANDALL and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ALBERT RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTIRE, CHRISTOPHER A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia V Islas