This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 22:15:00 (UTC).

RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER VS STERLING SETTLEMENTS

Case Summary

On 10/15/2004 RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against STERLING SETTLEMENTS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6381

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER LLC

Defendant and Appellant

STERLING SETTLEMENT INC A NEVADA CORPORATIO

Respondents and Defendants

JORGE CABRAL

STERLING SETTLEMENT INC A NEVADA CORPORATIO

APPELLATE DEPARTMENT OF RIVERSIDE COUNTY

STERLING SETTLEMENTS INC

RANCHO MIRAGE RIVER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

BEWLEY LASSLEBEN & MILLER

13215 East Penn Street Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF J SCOTT ZUNDEL

74-000 Country Club Dr #C-3

Palm Desert, CA 92260

BARAJAS, KATRINA

6454 Van Nuys Blvd Ste 211

Van Nuys, CA 91401

APPELLATE DEPARTMENT OF RIVERSIDE COUNTY

4100 Main St

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

APPELLATE DEPARTMENT OF RIVERSIDE COUNTY

4100 Main St

Riverside, CA 92501

BEWLEY LASSLEBEN & MILLER

13215 East Penn Street Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2004 OF RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC BY STERLING SETTLEMENTINC A NEVADA CORPORATIO REPRESENTED BY KATRINA BARAJAS FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2004 OF RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC BY JORGE CABRAL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN (NO MEMO)SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE BY STERLING SETTLEMENTS INC.

DECLARATION OF JOHN DEL POZZO

DECLARATION OF JOHN DEL POZZO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE FILED

DECLARATION OF THOMASA BAZAN-G

DECLARATION OF THOMASA BAZAN-GALVAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE FILED

MOTION TO/FOR RELIEF FROM FORF

MOTION TO/FOR RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE BY STERLING SETTLEMENTINC A NEVADA CORPORATIO FILED

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE.

DECLARATION OF J REESE/T WHEEL

DECLARATION OF J REESE/T WHEELER & E ZACHARY & MPAS IN OPPO FILED

REPLY TO PLTFS OPPO TO DEFTS M

REPLY TO PLTFS OPPO TO DEFTS MTN FOR RELIEF BY STERLING SETTLEMENTINC A NEVADA CORPORATIO FILED

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY STER

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY STERLING SETTLEMENTS IN DBA NAPOLI DBA II TANGO ON 01/21/05 FROM A CERTAIN JUDGEMENT ENTERED ON 12/23/04.

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED.

FILED: NOTIFICATION OF FILING

FILED: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL BY D. SANCHEZ

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED BY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED BY SETTLED STATEMENT BY STERLING SETTLEMENTS INC FILED

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2014
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2014
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO CLERK OF THE COURT CK#1656, IN THE AMOUNT OF $429.25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • FILE SENT TO VOL 2 FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION ON STERLING SETTLEMENTINC A NEVADA CORPORATIO BY RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC; Disposition: Sworn/Examined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCS SERVED ON STERLING SETTLEMENTS INC SERVED 07/24/06 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • JORGE CABRAL ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JORGE CABRAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2004 OF RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC BY JORGE CABRAL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • STERLING SETTLEMENTINC A NEVADA CORPORATIO ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS STERLING SETTLEMENTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2004 OF RANCHO MIRAGE RIVERLLC BY STERLING SETTLEMENTINC A NEVADA CORPORATIO REPRESENTED BY KATRINA BARAJAS FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 11/29/04 AT 8:00 IN CUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APPELLATE DEPARTMENT OF RIVERSIDE COUNTY is a litigant