This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 11:09:18 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS MAGNOLIA FOODS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 RAMIREZ filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against MAGNOLIA FOODS LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUNSHINE S SYKES and Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5792

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

SUNSHINE S SYKES

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURA RAMIREZ

Defendants

MAGNOLIA FOODS LLC

WORK 4 U AGENCY LLC

SCHX, LLC

NEXEM-ALLIED LLC

SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

Attorney at LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

8889 W. Olympic Blvd., Ste 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

SWERDLOW FLORENCE SANCHEZ SWERDLOW & WIMMER

Attorney at SWERDLOW FLORENCE SANCHEZ SWERDLOW & WIMMER

9401 Wilshire Blvd Suite 828

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

LAW OFFICES OF CHERYL A CANTY APC

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHERYL A CANTY APC

240 Newport Center Dr,Ste219-5

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

09/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/20/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Joint Status Conference Statement

09/13/2021: Joint Status Conference Statement

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Joint Status Conference Statement on Complaint of LAURA RAMIREZ

06/16/2021: Joint Status Conference Statement on Complaint of LAURA RAMIREZ

Certificate of Mailing

03/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/15/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Application to be Relieved as Attorney on Completion of Limited Scope Representation (Updated Application)

03/11/2021: Application to be Relieved as Attorney on Completion of Limited Scope Representation (Updated Application)

Declaration of Cheryl A Canty re good faith mistake and lack of cause to impose sanctions in accordance with local rule 3116

03/09/2021: Declaration of Cheryl A Canty re good faith mistake and lack of cause to impose sanctions in accordance with local rule 3116

Joint status conference statement

03/09/2021: Joint status conference statement

Proof of Service of Notice of Application to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record Upon Completion of Limited Scope Representation

02/26/2021: Proof of Service of Notice of Application to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record Upon Completion of Limited Scope Representation

Notice of Document Return.

02/26/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

02/25/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Application to/for be Relieved as Attorney on Completetion of Limited Scope Representation

02/18/2021: Application to/for be Relieved as Attorney on Completetion of Limited Scope Representation

Notice of Limited Scope Representation Form CIV-150

02/17/2021: Notice of Limited Scope Representation Form CIV-150

Notice of Document Return.

12/15/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Mailing

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

12/14/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed By: LAURA RAMIREZ; MAGNOLIA FOODS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference by LAURA RAMIREZ filed.; Filed By: LAURA RAMIREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/22/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2002 Receipt No.: CV191122-0210-FE.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/22/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2002 Receipt No.: CV191122-0205-FE.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/22/2019; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2002 Receipt No.: CV191122-0171-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of RAMIREZ and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Class Action. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of LAURA RAMIREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less