This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 02:43:21 (UTC).

RABBINOWITZ VS PALM DESERT DENTAL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2008 RABBINOWITZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PALM DESERT DENTAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9078

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED (INDIO)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2010
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING INDIO; Disposition: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2008
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING INDIO; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • DocketACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (INDIO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 12/02/08 AT 16:30 IN DEPT. 2K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED (INDIO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less