This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 12:10:05 (UTC).

RAABE VS SALING

Case Summary

On 05/05/2014 RAABE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0986

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES RAABE

Anaheim, CA 92801

Defendants

STUART SALING

Perris, CA 92570

SHANTASA SALING

Perris, CA 92570

PETER SCHUVER

Perris, CA 92570

SERENETY CHANNELL

Perris, CA 92570

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE SERVED ON SHANTASA SALING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE SERVED ON STUART SALING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE SERVED ON SERENETY CHANNELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE SERVED ON PETER SCHUVER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; MAILING DATE OF 05/08/14 FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE BY STUART SALING, SHANTASA SALING, PETER SCHUVER, SERENETY CHANNELL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY STUART SALING IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SHANTASA SALING IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY PETER SCHUVER IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SERENETY CHANNELL IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MERCEDES RAABE - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/06/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONOR

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/06/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 6/06/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MERCEDES RAABE - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SERENETY CHANNELL (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SERENETY CHANNELL IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • FEE WAIVER FOR SERENETY CHANNELL WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY PETER SCHUVER IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE SERVED ON STUART SALING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2014 OF MERCEDES RAABE SERVED ON SHANTASA SALING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/07/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 7/11/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less