This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 20:55:31 (UTC).

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. vs L&G PORTABLE CRUSHING & MATERIALS LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against L G PORTABLE CRUSHING MATERIALS LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1573

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC

Defendants

MILAN LUBANKO

L&G PORTABLE CRUSHING & MATERIALS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Asher Policar

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

09/17/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Judgment By Default By Court

09/08/2021: Judgment By Default By Court

Brief summary of the Case Pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 3.1800 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

04/26/2021: Brief summary of the Case Pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 3.1800 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

04/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

04/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment After Hearing filed.

04/13/2021: Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment After Hearing filed.

Notice of Document Return.

03/16/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Hearing on Right to Attach Order And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

03/08/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Right to Attach Order And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

02/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

02/17/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

01/26/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Application for Right to Attach Order: After Hearing, And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

01/26/2021: Application for Right to Attach Order: After Hearing, And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Declaration of Darrell Hailey in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Writ of Attachment

01/26/2021: Declaration of Darrell Hailey in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Writ of Attachment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

01/26/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Application for Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Department Assignment

01/14/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

12/16/2020: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/16/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Writ of Execution Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/23/2021; Fine Description: Check #2982 Receipt No.: 20210923-00285.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/23/2021; Fine Description: Check #2982 Receipt No.: 20210923-00285.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Case; For/Against: For - QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. Against - L&G PORTABLE CRUSHING & MATERIALS LLC Against - MILAN LUBANKO; Details; Costs: $450.00; Damages: $117,134.66; Subtotal Judgment: $117,584.66; Writ Fee: $40.00; Total: $117,624.66; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 09/23/2021; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Riverside on 09/23/2021 - expires on 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment By Default By Court; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Default Judgment Packet; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Brief summary of the Case Pursuant to California Rules of Court Rule 3.1800 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Darrell Hailey in Support of Entry of Default Judgment CCP 585 [d]; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application for Right to Attach Order: After Hearing, And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order And Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/14/2021; Fine Description: Check #8497 Receipt No.: 20210114-00076.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC.; Disposition: Default Judgment by Court 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR, RAYMOND A