This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 00:24:33 (UTC).

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC VS CSW CONTRACTORS

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CSW CONTRACTORS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9987

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROB CIZEK

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC

CSW CONTRACTORS INC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

CSW CONTRACTORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND A POLICAR

Post Office Box 74093

Davis, CA 95617

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HICKMAN & ROBINSONLLP

701 B St, Ste 1310

San Diego, CA 92101

NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP

555 South Flower Street 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF REBECCA J WINTH

DECLARATION OF REBECCA J WINTHROP IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE FILED

DECLARATION OF ROBERT P ROBINS

DECLARATION OF ROBERT P ROBINSON REGARDING MEET AND CONFER FOR DEFENDANT ROB CIZEKS DEMURRER FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REPLY MEMO OF PTS & AUTHORITIES ON RAYMOND A POLICAR ESQ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/08/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC BY ROB CIZEK REPRESENTED BY HICKMAN & ROBINSONLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000)

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO DEFENDANT ROB CIZEKS GENERAL AND SPECIAL DEMURRER BY ROB CIZEK FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC AS TO USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC

DEFT ROB CIZEKS NOTICE OF POST

DEFT ROB CIZEKS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUAN TO CODE OF CIVIL FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF FI

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF STAY ON HICKMAN & ROBINSON LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/23/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - OTHER: STAY ORDERED IN ARIZONA SUPERIOR COURT. AS TO DEFENDANT CSW CONTRACTORS INC FILED (CM-180).

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO GENERAL & SPECIAL DEMURRER BY ROB CIZEK FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2018 OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC AS TO CSW CONTRACTORS INC FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2018 OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC BY USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC REPRESENTED BY NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF USA WASTE O

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC REPRESENTED BY NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2018 OF USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RIC1806

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RIC1806799 BY USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: DECLARATION OF REBECCA J WINTHROP SUBMITTED BY USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REBECCA J WINTHROP IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • HODAUS HEARING SET FOR 06/25/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC AS TO ROB CIZEK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY PARTY NOT AT-ISSUE.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC BY ROB CIZEK; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 6/25/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/02/2018 OF USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC REPRESENTED BY NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2018 OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC BY USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC REPRESENTED BY NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2018 OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC AS TO CSW CONTRACTORS INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/01/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2018 OF QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSW CONTRACTORS, INC., AN ARIZONA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant