This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/15/2021 at 09:42:38 (UTC).

PULSE MARKETING INC vs CBD AMERICAN SHAMAN LLC

Case Summary

On 07/18/2019 PULSE MARKETING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CBD AMERICAN SHAMAN LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0845

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULSE MARKETING INC

Defendants

VINCE SANDERS

CBD AMERICAN SHAMAN LLC

TODD UNDERWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael B Wilson

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

05/14/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed)

05/06/2021: Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed)

Notice of Change of Counsel Contact Information on Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC

04/20/2021: Notice of Change of Counsel Contact Information on Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC

Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed)

03/10/2021: Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

11/25/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

System Generated Notice re: Mandatory Settlement Conference.

10/22/2020: System Generated Notice re: Mandatory Settlement Conference.

Notice OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION * by PULSE MARKETING INC filed.

10/08/2020: Notice OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION * by PULSE MARKETING INC filed.

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

09/11/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

09/08/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 09/11/20 at 8:30 in Department S302.

08/27/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 09/11/20 at 8:30 in Department S302.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Continuance of Hearing set for 09/08/2020.

08/17/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Continuance of Hearing set for 09/08/2020.

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest)

04/06/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest)

Legacy Minute Order: PULSE MARKETING INC/KUNDANI CHANG KHINDA WILSON LLP is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Responsive Pleadings.

04/06/2020: Legacy Minute Order: PULSE MARKETING INC/KUNDANI CHANG KHINDA WILSON LLP is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Responsive Pleadings.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 3/23/20.

03/23/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 3/23/20.

Proof of service by Mail of Request for Entry of Default on LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP with a mailing date of 03/17/20 filed. (non-complaint)

03/18/2020: Proof of service by Mail of Request for Entry of Default on LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP with a mailing date of 03/17/20 filed. (non-complaint)

Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC as to TODD UNDERWOOD filed.

03/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC as to TODD UNDERWOOD filed.

System Generated Notice re: OSC re: Failure to File Responsive Pleadings.

03/12/2020: System Generated Notice re: OSC re: Failure to File Responsive Pleadings.

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest)

03/12/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/16/2021

HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021

HearingType: Status Conference re: Proposed settlement at the 5/6/21 MSC; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021

HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2021

HearingType: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department 12; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2021

DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement; Filed By: CBD AMERICAN SHAMAN LLC; VINCE SANDERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Counsel Contact Information on Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC; Filed By: PULSE MARKETING INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

HearingType: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department 12; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
08/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Due Diligence Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC as to TODD UNDERWOOD filed by PULSE MARKETING INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: CASE ASSIGNMENT, CMC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92563.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC and filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2019

DocketFilings: Complaint of PULSE MARKETING INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2019

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2019; Fine Description: Check #251939 Receipt No.: CV190718-0676-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less