Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2018 at 09:08:43 (UTC).

PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B VS LANG

Case Summary

On 02/07/2007 PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against LANG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4826

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LA COLONIA LLC

WALKER DESIGN

POIETTE LANG

DOUGLASS R LANG

WALKER DESIGN SERVICES INC

NEXIDIS

BURTON MILLER

JAMES WALKER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

POIETTE LANG

DOUGLASS R LANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMPSON & COLGATELLP

3610 Fourteenth St P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92502

THOMPSON & COLEGATE LLP

3610 Fourteenth St P.O. Box 1299

Riverside, CA 92502

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DONALD B. CRIPE

7231 Boulder Ave Suite 547

Highland, CA 92346

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B SERVED ON POIETTE LANG FILED; DATE OF MAILING 02/22/07

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B SERVED ON DOUGLASS R LANG FILED; DATE OF MAILING 02/22/07

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B AS TO DOUGLASS R LANG FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TO S

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & ALLOW DEF TO FILE X/C IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE H. MORGAN DOUGHERTY.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B BY DOUGLASS R LANG, POIETTE LANG REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF DONALD B. CRIPE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DOUGLASS R

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DOUGLASS R LANG, POIETTE LANG REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF DONALD B. CRIPE FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE VIA COURT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE VIA COURTCALL AT CMC BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B SERVED ON LA COLONIA LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/21/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY DO

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY DOUGLASS R LANG, POIETTE LANG FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG AS TO LA COLONIA LLC; MAILING DATE OF 08/08/07 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B FILED WITH PREJUDICE

FILED: WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDE

FILED: WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG FILED.

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - BANKRUPTCY AS TO DEFENDANT WALKER DESIGN SERVICES INC, JAMES WALKER FILED. (FORM CM-180)

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C FOR ALL PURPOSES

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2010
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 1C TO 2F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 08/11/08; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 08/11/08; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 08/11/08; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF DONALD B CRIPE RE OSC FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT OSC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/23/2007 OF DOUGLASS LANG SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 08/11/08; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - BANKRUPTCY AS TO DEFENDANT WALKER DESIGN SERVICES INC, JAMES WALKER FILED. (FORM CM-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2007
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B AS TO POIETTE LANG (SINGLE DEFENDANT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • NPS HEARING SET FOR 04/09/07 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: DEFTS SERVED 2/22/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2007
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B SERVED ON DOUGLASS R LANG FILED; DATE OF MAILING 02/22/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2007 OF PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B SERVED ON POIETTE LANG FILED; DATE OF MAILING 02/22/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F S B FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALKER DESIGN SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK F.S.B. A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant