This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 13:43:12 (UTC).

PROVIDENCE VS CLANTON

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 PROVIDENCE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLANTON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0686

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

BRENT CLANTON

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHONFELD, DAVID S

801 E Chapman Ave Suite 214

Fullerton, CA 92831

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BRENT CLANTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/25/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AS TO BRENT CLANTON, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/25/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/08/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 05/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/25/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AS TO BRENT CLANTON, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BRENT CLANTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/25/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/26/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF PROVIDENCE II HARBOR GRAND APARTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less