This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/05/2018 at 20:10:58 (UTC).

PROSTITIS & PROSTITIS

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 PROSTITIS PROSTITIS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Family Law Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1480

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENNIFER E. PROSTITIS

Respondent

CHRISTOPHER PROSTITIS

Riverside, CA 92507

Not Classified By Court

KAITLYN PROSTITIS

CARL WARREN & COMPANY 401(K) PLAN II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JULIE M HILL

3865 Jurupa Ave.

Riverside, CA 92506

Respondent Attorney

HOLSTROM, BLOCK & PARKE

1897 California Ave Ste 102

Corona, CA 92881

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF FOAH FROM 10-17-17 COURT HEARING ON CHRISTOPHER PROSTITIS WITH MAILING DATE OF 11/01/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING OF 10-17-17; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON. (FL-340)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING SUBMITTED BY JENNIFER E. PROSTITIS HAS BEEN PREPPED AND FORWARDED TO F402 FOR SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JENNIFER E. PROSTITIS. (FL-141)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JENNIFER E. PROSTITIS. (FL-150)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PTNRS CURRENT INC/EXP DEC SERVED ON CHRISTOPHER PROSTITIS SERVED 10/17/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • FORMAL REPORT ON GUIDELINE SUPPORT COMMENCING 09/01/17 FILED (XSPOUSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • FORMAL REPORT ON GUIDELINE SUPPORT COMMENCING 01/01/18 FILED (XSPOUSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • ORDER PURSUANT TO REFERRAL TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER ON REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON.

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY JENNIFER E. PROSTITIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 4/12/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 4/13/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 6/12/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD(REN) FILED 04/13/2017 OF JENNIFER PROSTITIS (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 09/25/99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 04/12/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less