This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 06:48:51 (UTC).

PROSPECT FUNDING VS BAKAL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 PROSPECT FUNDING filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against BAKAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5629

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Respondents

RONALD BAKAL LAW OFFICE

RONALD BAKAL ESQ

Applicant

PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE FILED

JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF SISTE

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE APPLIC

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE APPLICATION FILED 08/12/2019 OF PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC SERVED ON RONALD BAKAL LAW OFFICE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/23/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE APPLIC

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE APPLICATION FILED 08/12/2019 OF PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC SERVED ON RONALD BAKAL ESQ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/23/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF RACHEL ROSS IN

DECLARATION OF RACHEL ROSS IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY MARY BAK

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY MARY BAKAL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF HEARING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION ON MARY BAKAL ESQ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/02/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

FILED: NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE

FILED: NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION- MARY BAKAL-HEARING 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY MARY BAK

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY MARY BAKAL FILED.

FILED: REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITI

FILED: REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

ORDER FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION I

ORDER FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DEN AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DEN AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY MARY BAKAL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketMOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: NTC OF CLAIM SET FOR 01/15/20 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PROSPECT FUNDING FOR HEARING 01/15/20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketHEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET 1/15/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE APPLICATION FILED 08/12/2019 OF PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC SERVED ON RONALD BAKAL ESQ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/23/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE APPLICATION FILED 08/12/2019 OF PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC SERVED ON RONALD BAKAL LAW OFFICE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/23/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNOTE: PROOF OF SERVICE REQUIRED BEFORE ISSUANCE OFWRIT/ABSTRACT (ISSUE 30 DAYS AFTER SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less