This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/02/2018 at 19:27:48 (UTC).

PROLIEN SERVICES VS PRO PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 PROLIEN SERVICES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRO PROPERTY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1523

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROLIEN SERVICES LLC

Defendant

PRO PROPERTY SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JARED D PETERSON

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92264.

NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE A

NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF HEARING RE STATUS CO

NOTICE OF HEARING RE STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING-11/8/17 FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING 09/27/17 FIL

NOTICE OF HEARING 09/27/17 FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC SERVED ON PRO PROPERTY SOLUTIONS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/29/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AND FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/29/17.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • FAX FILING BY PROLIEN SERVICES LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING-11/8/17 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AGAINST COUNSEL FOR FTA AT 6/29/17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, MONETARY SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING 09/27/17 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FAX FILING BY PROLIEN SERVICES LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • FAX FILING BY PROLIEN SERVICES LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC SERVED ON PRO PROPERTY SOLUTIONS LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/29/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF PROLIEN SERVICES LLC AGAINST COUNSEL FOR FTA AT 6/29/17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, MONETARY SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED.; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/29/17.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • PROLIEN SERVICES LLC/LAW OFFICES OF JARED D PETERSON IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.; Disposition: OSC & Sanctions ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 05/24/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/24/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92264.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET 3/21/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less