This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 13:45:23 (UTC).

PROJECT TOUCH V WALL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2014 PROJECT TOUCH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1779

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROJECT TOUCH

Defendants

GENEA WALL

Temecula, CA 92592

EVORI WALL

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF PROJECT TOUCH BY GENEA WALL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON H G LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/06/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GENEA WALL IS GRANTED; CLERK A ZAVALA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF PROJECT TOUCH AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO EVORI WALL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/01/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF PROJECT TOUCH AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/01/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF PROJECT TOUCH AS TO EVORI WALL, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PROJECT TOUCH - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/05/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/05/14 MV1UD JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PROJECT TOUCH.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT MV1.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 5/18/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. RIEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT MV1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PROJECT TOUCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/05/14 MV1UD JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/05/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON H G LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/06/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/01/2014 OF PROJECT TOUCH BY GENEA WALL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/30/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less