This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 11:19:23 (UTC).

PREWITT VS UNEMPLOYMENT

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 PREWITT filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against UNEMPLOYMENT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0404

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARCIA J PREWITT

Respondents

UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALSBOARD

MEDIACOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PERSHING SQUARE LAW FIRM

555 W Fifth St 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE B

NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT CALIF UNEMPLOYMENT INS. APPEALS BOARD BY UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALSBOARD FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY MARCIA J PREWITT FILED.

1ST AMENDED WRIT OF MANDAMUS (

1ST AMENDED WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) OF MARCIA PREWITT FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) OF MARCIA PREWITT AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: F/F PROOF OF SERVICE.

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON WRIT OF MAND

SUMMONS ISSUED ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 04/17/2017 OF MARCIA PREWITT AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ST

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: STATUS CONFERENCE.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • STATUS HEARING RE: WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • MARCIA J PREWITT/PERSHING SQUARE LAWFIRM IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: F/F PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • STATUS HEARING RE: WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE); Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • FAX FILING BY MARCIA J PREWITT ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) OF MARCIA PREWITT AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) OF MARCIA PREWITT FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: AMENDED PETITION AND SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY MARCIA J PREWITT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: AMENDED PETITION/SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY MARCIA J PREWITT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY MARCIA J PREWITT.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: STATUS CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY MARCIA J PREWITT\ FOR HEARING 07/17/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • STATUS HEARING SET 7/17/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED 11/20/2017 OF MARCIA PREWITT AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - EXTRAORDNINARY WRITS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S302 - WRIT OF MANDATE/PROHIBITION/REVIEW (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (MANDATE) FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIACOM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNEMPLOYEMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD is a litigant