This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 08:23:32 (UTC).

PREEMINENT vs BOWDEN

Case Summary

On 01/24/2014 PREEMINENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOWDEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0202

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION

Defendants

LISA BOWDEN

Wildomar, CA 92595

WAYNE BOWDEN

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWITT, HACKMAN, SHAPIRO, MARSHALL &HARLAN

16633 Ventura Blvd. 11Th Fl.

Encino, CA 91436-1870

LEWITT HACKMAN SHAPIRO MARSHALL & HARLAN

16633 Ventura Blvd. 11Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436-1865

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92595.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/24/2014 OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO WAYNE BOWDEN; AND MAILED ON 01/28/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/24/2014 OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO LISA BOWDEN; AND MAILED ON 01/28/14 FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY LISA BOWDEN IS GRANTED; CLERK L.FULSAAS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION BY LISA BOWDEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AS TO WAYNE BOWDEN; MAILING DATE OF 02/11/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/07/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AS TO WAYNE BOWDEN FILED.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION BY PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LISA BOWDEN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/06/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE CORRECTION RE: SIGNATUR

NOTICE CORRECTION RE: SIGNATURE IN DEFENDANTS PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORP BY PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED.

ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS

ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/14/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION BY PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE CORRECTION RE: SIGNATURE IN DEFENDANTS PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORP BY PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF SIMON ZHANG IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF KEVIN JENKINS I/S/O MOTION FOR SUMM JUDG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/24/2014 OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO WAYNE BOWDEN; AND MAILED ON 01/28/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF PREEMINENT INVESTMENT CORPORATION AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/28/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92595.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/28/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less