This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 05:28:30 (UTC).

PORTOLA COUNTRY VS PALM DESERT 210

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 PORTOLA COUNTRY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PALM DESERT 210. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0528

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

PALM DESERT 210 LTD

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

C I POOL

WESTERN LAND & DEVELOPMENT CO

CONSTANCE H HARPER

VIRGINIA B PEARSON

JACK H BENNETT CO-VENTURE LTD

JORGE E LUHAN MD INC. PENSION PLAN

CARROL L HARPER

CARL J MCKEE JR

RICHARD A ARNOLD

CASA LAGUNA CORPORATION

BOUCHET ARNOLD

HARVEY J PEARSON

ROB SASLOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC

10200 Willow Creek Road Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

EPSTEN, APC

10200 Willow Creek Rd Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2019 OF PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION FILED.

DECLARATION OF RAMONA LINNELL

DECLARATION OF RAMONA LINNELL IN SUPP OF PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSO REQ FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQ FOR ENTRY;NTC OF EBIDENTIARY;PTNS & AUTH ON SEE ATTACHED LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/01/20 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ST

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIP OF DEF ROB SASLOW/ORDER ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/03/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY MA

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/10/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2019 OF PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION NAMING DOES 009 TO BE RICHARD A ARNOLD FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2019 OF PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION NAMING DOES 8 TO BE C I POOL FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CIVIL MINUTE ORDER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/18/19.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2019 OF PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT RICHARD A ARNOLD, BOUCHET ARNOLD, CARROL L HARPER, CONSTANCE H HARPER, CASA LAGUNA CORPORATION, JORGE E LUHAN MD INC. PENSION PLAN, JACK H BENNETT CO-VENTURE LTD, WESTERN LAND & DEVELOPMENT CO, HARVEY J PEARSON FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DECLARATION OF /RE EX PARTE AP

DECLARATION OF /RE EX PARTE APP F/ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR OR

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION FILED

DECLARATION OF REGARDING NOTIC

DECLARATION OF REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HR RE PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSO REQ FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION/EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HR RE PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSO REQ FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketPORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION/EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RE ROB SASLOW RECEIVED ON 07/02/20 SUBMITTED BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HR RE PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSO REQ FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION/EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: PROVE-UP HEARING FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - RES101915; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPOS TIMELY/WAIVED - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUL ON CALENDAR 07/01/20 IS TIMELY/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HRG RE JUDGMENT / OSC ON 07/01/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCONTINUANCE OF HEARING NON PROOF OF SERVICE FEE PAID BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) BY PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2019 OF PORTOLA COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERSASSOCIATION AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/25/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less