Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 06:46:56 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS LARSON

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LARSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3375

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

TRINA LARSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Check #2458 Receipt No.: CV200721-0072-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant