This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 07:05:40 (UTC).

POPE VS CUNHA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 POPE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CUNHA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1764

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA POPE

Defendants

RALPH CUNHA

RAPHAEL CUNHA

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED

ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO RALPH CUNHA, SERVED ON DATE OF 01/16/17.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATIO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION & ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT SERVED ON RALPH CUNHA SERVED 01/16/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR RALPH CUNHA BY JESSICA POPE FILED. HONORABLE COMMISSIONER WILLIAM A ANDERSON. (SMALL CLAIMS)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 05/20/2016 OF JESSICA POPE AS TO RALPH CUNHA, MAILING DATE OF 05/21/16 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (MORENO VALLEY)

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $6,50

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $6,500.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $4,50

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $4,500.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $2,50

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $2,500.00.

AFFIDAVIT OF CANCELLED SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF CANCELLED SERVICE FOR RALPH CUNHA ON BENCH WARRANT

WARRANT RECALL NOTICE

WARRANT RECALL NOTICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE JUDGMENT DEBTORS EXAM.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $6,500.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $25.73 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $273.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $4,500.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1,687.32 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $273.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $2,500.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $704.40 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $273.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION (SMALL CLAIMS) ON RAPHAEL CUNHA BY JESSICA POPE (HEARING); Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CANCELLED SERVICE FOR RALPH CUNHA ON BENCH WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WARRANT RECALL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • HEARING ON JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION (SMALL CLAIMS) SET 6/16/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (MORENO VALLEY); Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED 05/20/2016 OF JESSICA POPE AS TO RAPHAEL CUNHA, MAILING DATE OF 05/21/16 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 7/08/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT.MV1 - MORENO VALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (MORENO VALLEY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT MV1. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less