This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/03/2020 at 01:14:31 (UTC).

POOL & ELECTRICAL VS STEMPIEN

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 POOL ELECTRICAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEMPIEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3483

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Defendants

SEAN MICHAEL STEMPIEN

STATE NATIONAL INSURNACE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAY, MICHAEL D

532 West First Street Suite 209

Claremont, CA 91711

Defendant Attorney

CURSER MITCHELL NOVITZ SANCHEZGASTON &

800 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - UNDER $10K FILED. (CORONA)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC SERVED ON STATE NATIONAL INSURNACE COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/31/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC AS TO SEAN MICHAEL STEMPIEN; MAILING DATE OF 01/16/20 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC AS TO SEAN MICHAEL STEMPIEN FILED.

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANC

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 07/01/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC AS TO SEAN MICHAEL STEMPIEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 07/01/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC BY STATE NATIONAL INSURNACE COMPANY INC REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCHANGE ATTORNEY ON STATE NATIONAL INSURNACE COMPANY INC FROM PRO/PER TO CURSER MITCHELL NOVITZ SANCHEZGASTON & ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC AS TO SEAN MICHAEL STEMPIEN; MAILING DATE OF 01/16/20 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC SERVED ON STATE NATIONAL INSURNACE COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/31/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - UNDER $10K FILED. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 7/01/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/28/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2019 OF POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant