This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 09:10:06 (UTC).

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS VS SCOTT

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 POOL ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCOTT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3009

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Defendants

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

S. MARTIN SCOTT LLC

S. MARTIN SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL D MAY, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney at MICHAEL D MAY, ATTORNEY AT LAW

MAY, MICHAEL D

532 West First Street Suite 209

Claremont, CA 91711

MICHAEL D MAY

Defendant Attorney

HAUSMAN & SOSA

Attorney at HAUSMAN & SOSA

20750 Ventura Blvd, Ste. 105

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6646

 

Court Documents

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

04/13/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Proof of Service Summons on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

04/28/2021: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Judgment by Court by Default on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

09/20/2021: Judgment by Court by Default on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Declaration of Lisa Decuir and Michael D. May in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Application for Court Judgment [C.C.P. 585 (b)]

06/23/2021: Declaration of Lisa Decuir and Michael D. May in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Application for Court Judgment [C.C.P. 585 (b)]

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

06/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Request for Dismissal

06/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

08/03/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

07/13/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Proof of Service Summons on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

04/28/2021: Proof of Service Summons on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Notice of Document Return.

04/30/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Mailing

04/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/29/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

04/13/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Notice of Document Return.

01/11/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Continued Trial Setting Conference

01/06/2021: Notice of Continued Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

01/05/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

Minute Order: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE.

01/05/2021: Minute Order: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

12/14/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; For/Against: For - POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC Against - S. MARTIN SCOTT LLC Against - S. MARTIN SCOTT; Details; Principal: $6,879.11; Costs: $570.00; Accrued Interest: $1,617.03; Attorney Fees: $1,237.50; Subtotal Judgment: $10,303.64; Total: $10,303.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Court by Default on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; Filed By: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Held - Pre-disposition OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingType: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or Dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE.; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Lisa Decuir and Michael D. May in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Application for Court Judgment [C.C.P. 585 (b)]; Filed By: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; Filed By: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amounts up to $10,000 including unlawful detainer (GC70614B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV200824-0141-V.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil General Denial under $10,000.00 to Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC by OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY represented by HAUSMAN & SOSA filed.; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Overage Refund Trust (SAP 353031); Amount: $0.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2020; Fine Description: Check #272677 Receipt No.: CV200715-0172-CK.1; Paid: $15.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/21/2020; Fine Description: Void / Reversal, Reason: OTHER, CV200821-0054-VP OVERPAYMENT Receipt No.: CV200715-0172-CK.2; Paid: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2020; Fine Description: Check #272677 Receipt No.: CV200715-0111-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Assignment to Department for All Purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Under $10K filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; Disposition: Default Judgment by Court 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAY MICHAEL D. ESQ.