This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 10:02:53 (UTC).

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS VS AQUA TECH POOL CARE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 POOL ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AQUA TECH POOL CARE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0433

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

AQUA TECH POOL CARE LLC

PETER KENNETH SCHROEDER

HEATHER ELIZABETH SCHROEDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney at MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW

532 West First Street Suite 209

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

02/04/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Legacy Minute Order: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).

10/20/2020: Legacy Minute Order: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).

System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

10/15/2020: System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

Proof of Service on the Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC served on HEATHER ELIZABETH SCHROEDER with service date of 09/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

09/28/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC served on HEATHER ELIZABETH SCHROEDER with service date of 09/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Proof of Service on the Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC served on AQUA TECH POOL CARE LLC with service date of 09/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

09/28/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC served on AQUA TECH POOL CARE LLC with service date of 09/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC as to PETER KENNETH SCHROEDER; mailing date of 09/25/20 filed.

09/28/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC as to PETER KENNETH SCHROEDER; mailing date of 09/25/20 filed.

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

07/20/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

07/13/2020: System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 07/20/20 at 8:30 in Department C1.

07/06/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 07/20/20 at 8:30 in Department C1.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

01/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC and filed.

01/21/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC and filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • HearingType: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingType: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Continued - Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC/MICHAEL D MAY ATTORNEY AT LAW is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Order to Show Cause re Sanctions on 10/20/20 at 8:30 in Department C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC served on HEATHER ELIZABETH SCHROEDER with service date of 09/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC served on AQUA TECH POOL CARE LLC with service date of 09/19/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC as to PETER KENNETH SCHROEDER; mailing date of 09/25/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 07/20/20 at 8:30 in Department C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/21/2020; Fine Description: Check #268271 Receipt No.: CV200121-0040-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Ntc of Assignmt to Dept For All Purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAY MICHAEL D. ESQ.