This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 08:31:59 (UTC).

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS VS ANCHOR POOLS

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 POOL ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANCHOR POOLS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tamara L. Wagner and Eric V. Isaac. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0695

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tamara L. Wagner

Eric V. Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Defendant

ANCHOR POOLSLLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1500 and less than or equal to $5000 filed. (Corona)

09/03/2020: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1500 and less than or equal to $5000 filed. (Corona)

Notice of Department Reassignment and Telephonic Appearance. Hearing scheduled on 01/20/21 has been rescheduled for Telephonic Appearance re: Small Claims Hearing on 12/15/20 at 1:30 in Dept. MV2(Deft not Served)

10/29/2020: Notice of Department Reassignment and Telephonic Appearance. Hearing scheduled on 01/20/21 has been rescheduled for Telephonic Appearance re: Small Claims Hearing on 12/15/20 at 1:30 in Dept. MV2(Deft not Served)

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

12/15/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Minute Order: Small Claims Hearing - Corona

12/15/2020: Minute Order: Small Claims Hearing - Corona

Notice of Resetting of Small Claims Hearing

12/15/2020: Notice of Resetting of Small Claims Hearing

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

01/22/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

02/11/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

Certificate of Mailing

02/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; Filed By: POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing - Corona; Judicial Officer: Tamara L. Wagner; Location/Courtroom: Department C2; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing - Corona; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Resetting of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Small Claims Hearing - Corona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Department Reassignment and Telephonic Appearance. Hearing scheduled on 01/20/21 has been rescheduled for Telephonic Appearance re: Small Claims Hearing on 12/15/20 at 1:30 in Dept. MV2(Deft not Served)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $1,500 but less than or equal to $5,000 (CCP116.230B2); Amount: $50.00; Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/17/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV200917-0161-V.1; Paid: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1500 and less than or equal to $5000 filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - Corona of POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC; Disposition: Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant