Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/02/2016 at 00:49:52 (UTC).

POLLARD VS GILLEN

Case Summary

On 10/15/2014 POLLARD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GILLEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2428

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYAN POLLARD

Menifee, CA 92584

SCOTT POLLARD

Menifee, CA 92584

Defendant

MARCUS GILLEN

Wildomar, CA 92595

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92584.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARCUS GILLEN IS GRANTED; CLERK T.DANIELS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2014 OF RYAN POLLARD BY MARCUS GILLEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON RYAN & SCOTT POLLARD WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/05/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/15/2014 OF RYAN POLLARD SERVED ON MARCUS GILLEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/30/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY RYAN POLLARD, SCOTT POLLARD - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 01/16/15 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RYAN POLLARD, SCOTT POLLARD.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; FULLY SATISFIED FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; FULLY SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RYAN POLLARD, SCOTT POLLARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 01/16/15 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 1/16/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY RYAN POLLARD, SCOTT POLLARD - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARCUS GILLEN (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARCUS GILLEN IS GRANTED; CLERK T.DANIELS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/15/14 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less