This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2018 at 02:18:11 (UTC).

PIERRE PALMER VS KB HOME COASTAL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2013 PIERRE PALMER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME COASTAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1979

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALFONSO & DIANA MONTES

EDWARD EVELYN H AND JAMIE CHAVEZ

GUSTAVO & DANIELLEJUAREZ

RAYMOND YSIANO

LINDSAY ORTIZ

MARCELLINE M MARIN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMERICAN COATINGS INC

DYNAMIC PLUMBING SFH INC

MERIT MASONRY INC

CNSE COUNTERTOPS INC

FENCEWORKS INC

AQUATIC CO

COLLINS ELECTRIC

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC

SOUTHWEST FINISH &SUPPLY INC

LEONARDS CARPET SERVICE INC

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC

PETERSEN-DEAN INC

39300 Civic Center Dr Ste 300

Fremont, CA 94538

MOES 001 THROUGH 100

Intervenor Defendant

POES 1 THROUGH 50

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DYNAMIC PLUMBING SFH INC

CNSE COUNTERTOPS INC

95 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN ADELMAN, LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PICOZZI, EDWARD M.

32631 Highway 79

Warner Springs, CA 92086

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

NORRIS, ARCHER

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LETOFSKY/MCCLAIN

3655 Nobel Drive, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92122

BUREK, LAW OFFICE O F LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive Suite 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HAMMONS & BALDINO

2601 Airport Dr #105

Torrance, CA 90505

SKANE WILCOX LLP

33 New Montgomery St #1250

San Francisco, CA 94105

DANIEL CROWLEY & ASSOCIATES

37 Old Courthouse Square Suite 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

18100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92612

HINES CARDER

3090 Bristol St. #300

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Pl #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

PETERSEN-DEAN

39300 Civic Center Dr Ste 300

Fremont, CA 94538

Other Attorneys

GRAVES & KING

3610 Fourteenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92502

OLIVA & ASSOCIATESALC

11770 Bernardo Plaza Court Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92128

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave #750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& OMEARA LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN

10960 Wilshire Boulevard 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024-3804

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E Hospitality Lane #600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

SCHAFFER, LAX, MCNAUGHTON & CHEN

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF KB HOME COASTAL INC AS TO DEFENDANT R.E.M. CONCEPTS INC, DARLAND PAINTING INCORPORATED, DYNAMIC PLUMBING SFH INC, PACIFIC COAST DRYWALL & PAINT INC, RESCOM OVERHEAD DOORS INC, ROYAL CONCRETE, WALKER WOOD PRODUCTS, GINGER MASONRY LP FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SET

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MERIT MASONRY INC.

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

DECLARATION OF ALLISON B ETKIN

DECLARATION OF ALLISON B ETKIN PURSUANT TO IN ADVANCE OF 7/13/17 OSC RE:DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2013 OF KB HOME COASTAL INC SERVED ON CROWN SHEET METAL INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/02/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2013 OF KB HOME COASTAL INC BY MERIT MASONRY INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE ON

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE ON REM CONCEPTS INC DBA ABC WINDOW CO FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF PIERRE PALMER SERVED ON TEAM HEATING & AIRCONDITIONINGINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/18/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF REQUES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY KB HOME COASTAL INC FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF PIERRE PALMER REMOVE ATTORNEY PETERSEN-DEAN FOR PARTY(S) PETERSEN-DEAN INC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY SKANE WILCOX LLP

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ITS MOT

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND RELATED JOINDERS BY KB HOME COASTAL INC FILED

ORDER GRANTING KB HOME COASTAL

ORDER GRANTING KB HOME COASTALS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS CO

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF KB HOME COASTAL INC BY WESTCOR CONSTRUCTION OF CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY GRAVES & KING FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH SET

ORDER APPROVING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO SOUTHWEST FINISH &SUPPLY INC FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO KB

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO KB HOMES MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO 8TH CAUSE OF ACTION BY KB HOME COASTAL INC FILED.

RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT

RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL BY PETERSEN-DEAN INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF KB HOME COASTAL INC AS TO DEFENDANT SOUTHWEST FINISH &SUPPLY INC FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLI

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY CROWN SHEET METAL INC.

355 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT - RES68989; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH PETERSEN-DEAN INC BY KB HOME COASTAL INC; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • HMOTI HEARING SET FOR 08/03/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: PER NTC OF TAKING MTN OFF CALENDAR FILED 7/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT OFF CALENDAR BY KB HOME COASTAL INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT SET FOR 08/03/17 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO/FOR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH PETERSEN-DEAN INC BY KB HOME COASTAL INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALLISON B ETKIN PURSUANT TO IN ADVANCE OF 7/13/17 OSC RE:DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
583 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2013
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON KB HOME COASTAL INC FROM WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN TO WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PIERRE PALMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF PIERRE PALMER SERVED ON KB HOME COASTAL INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/12/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 12/23/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF PIERRE PALMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92203.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2 (COMPLEX CASE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLLINS ELECTRIC ACALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DYNAMIC PLUMBING SFH INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST FINISH & SUPPLY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN COATINGS INC is a litigant