This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 00:45:52 (UTC).

PGA WEST ET AL V LA QUINTA VILLAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2009 PGA WEST filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LA QUINTA VILLAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8754

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

LA QUINTA VILLAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN

Cross Defendants

T&M LATH & PLASTERINC.

ROBERT L HOOTEN

RAINCROSS CONTRACTORS INC

BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERS & FREEDMAN L.L.P.

191 Calle Magdalena, #220

Encinitas, CA 92024

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave #200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

21660 Copley Drive Suite 310

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

MARSHAL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

2030 Main Street Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

4500 Pacific Coast Highway 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3298

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2009 OF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC SERVED ON LA QUINTA VILLAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/30/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN SERVED ON BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/14/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN BY RAINCROSS CONTRACTORS INC REPRESENTED BY MARSHAL FRENCH & DEGRAVE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN AS TO ROBERT L HOOTEN

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERV

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT ON T&M LATH FILED.

ORDER FOR SERVICE OF CROSS-COM

ORDER FOR SERVICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT ON T&M LATH & PLASTER BY SERVING CA SECRETARY (GRANTED); HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN SERVED ON T&M LATH & PLASTERINC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/05/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC SERVED ON LA QUINTA VILLAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/28/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN BY ROBERT L HOOTEN REPRESENTED BY ANDREWS & RHODES LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC

DECLARATION OF TRACY FULLER LI

DECLARATION OF TRACY FULLER LINKOWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIALS EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - BANKRUPTCY AS TO DEFENDANT BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION INC FILED. (FORM CM-180)

ORDER SETTING MADATORY SETTLEM

ORDER SETTING MADATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

DECLARATION OF TRACY FULLER LI

DECLARATION OF TRACY FULLER LINKOWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLTF PGA WEST II FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2012
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Reset to change Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN SERVED ON ROBERT L HOOTEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/26/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2009 OF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC BY GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 09/17/2009 OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2009 OF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC SERVED ON GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN FILED; DATE OF MAILING 08/17/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2009 OF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC AS TO GREENWAY DEVELOPMENT AN ENTITYOF UNKNOWN WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 08/31/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2009 OF PGA WEST II RESIDENTIAL ASSOCIATION INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant