Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 07:58:57 (UTC).

PERKINS vs WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING-NORCO ESTATES LLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 PERKINS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING-NORCO ESTATES LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4281

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT R PERKINS

Norco, CA 92860

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA N A

WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING-NORCO ESTATES LLC

PROBER & RAPHAEL ALC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

04/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

04/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Certificate of Mailing

04/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/21/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

10/28/2020: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by ROBERT R PERKINS is Granted; Clerk L.VILLANUEVA (Granted) Form FW-003.

10/27/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by ROBERT R PERKINS is Granted; Clerk L.VILLANUEVA (Granted) Form FW-003.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint of PERKINS and filed.

10/27/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of PERKINS and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92860.

10/27/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92860.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

10/27/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to ROBERT R PERKINS; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to ROBERT R PERKINS; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by ROBERT R PERKINS is Granted; Clerk L.VILLANUEVA (Granted) Form FW-003.; Filed By: ROBERT R PERKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees filed by ROBERT R PERKINS (Form FW-001).; Filed By: ROBERT R PERKINS; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92860.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of PERKINS and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ROBERT R PERKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prober and Raphael, ALC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant