This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 12:53:31 (UTC).

PEREZ vs COON

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are IRMA POOLE ASBERRY and Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3775

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

IRMA POOLE ASBERRY

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABRIEL PEREZ

RAQUEL PEREZ

DOMINIC PEREZ

Defendants

JOHN COON MD

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

NEW IMAGE BARIATRIC SURGICAL ASSOCIATES

JOHN L COON MD INC

JOHN COON, MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEINBERG, STEVEN J.

MCCUNE WRIGHT AREVALO, LLP

Attorney at MCCUNE WRIGHT AREVALO, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ

Attorney at PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

Attorney at DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

10/04/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

10/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference

09/29/2021: Minute Order: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

09/21/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Amended Trial Setting Order

04/15/2021: Amended Trial Setting Order

Minute Order: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference

04/14/2021: Minute Order: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference

Declaration of Steven J Weinberg in support of plaintiffs objection to non-consensual remote jury trial and request for continuance

04/08/2021: Declaration of Steven J Weinberg in support of plaintiffs objection to non-consensual remote jury trial and request for continuance

Notice of Joinder to Objection to Non-Consensual Remote Jury Trial and to the Trial Setting Order

04/07/2021: Notice of Joinder to Objection to Non-Consensual Remote Jury Trial and to the Trial Setting Order

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

03/23/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Plaintiffs' Objection to non-consensual remote jury trial and to the trial setting order on Complaint of RAQUEL PEREZ

03/23/2021: Plaintiffs' Objection to non-consensual remote jury trial and to the trial setting order on Complaint of RAQUEL PEREZ

Notice of Ruling re: Motion for Summary Judgment filed

10/27/2020: Notice of Ruling re: Motion for Summary Judgment filed

Tentative Rulings for 10/23/2020

10/23/2020: Tentative Rulings for 10/23/2020

Order Motion for Summary Judgment denied. Honorable Judge Irma Poole Asberry.

10/23/2020: Order Motion for Summary Judgment denied. Honorable Judge Irma Poole Asberry.

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on Complaint of PEREZ by JOHN COON MD, JOHN L COON MD INC

10/23/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on Complaint of PEREZ by JOHN COON MD, JOHN L COON MD INC

Trial Setting Order - Honorable Judge Irma Poole Asberry

10/15/2020: Trial Setting Order - Honorable Judge Irma Poole Asberry

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

10/14/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Opposition to OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION by RAQUEL PEREZ, GABRIEL PEREZ, DOMINIC PEREZ filed

10/13/2020: Opposition to OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION by RAQUEL PEREZ, GABRIEL PEREZ, DOMINIC PEREZ filed

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on Complaint of PEREZ by JOHN COON MD, JOHN L COON MD INC

10/08/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment on Complaint of PEREZ by JOHN COON MD, JOHN L COON MD INC

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Trial Setting Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing Re: Trial Readiness Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Original Summons on Complaint of PEREZ Returned and Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff DOMINIC PEREZ named as VANESSA R ENRIQUEZ is Granted; Honorable Judge Irma Poole Asberry.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/15/2019; Fine Description: Check #D3686484 Receipt No.: CV190715-0368-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of RAQUEL PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant