This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 18:56:38 (UTC).

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION VS JACKSON

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JACKSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3966

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Defendant

ARLENE JACKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL I SCHILLER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL I SCHILLER

3838 Carson St #106

Torrance, CA 90503

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Default Judgment

06/17/2021: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Default Judgment

Certificate of Mailing

06/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/17/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

06/01/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

03/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Proof of Service on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

02/22/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

02/16/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

02/16/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

Certificate of Mailing

02/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

02/16/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

02/01/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92571.

08/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92571.

Summons Issued on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC and filed.

08/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

08/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Under $10K filed. (Moreno Valley)

08/20/2020: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Under $10K filed. (Moreno Valley)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 as to LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL I SCHILLER; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Default Judgment; Filed By: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC; Filed By: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/21/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV200821-0036-V.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92571.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Under $10K filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC is a litigant