This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/06/2017 at 06:03:22 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. WHITLEY S. NEAL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2012 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WHITLEY S NEAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Hall Of Justice located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0091

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

WHITLEY SHANEL NEAL

Other

MORENO VALLEY COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RIVERSIDE

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Other Attorney

MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC

13800 Heacock Ave Suite D201

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

 

Court Documents

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLA

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APP

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

FILE: STOP NTC SENT RE ICORREC

FILE: STOP NTC SENT RE ICORRECT COVER/P.O.S FOR AO

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILE

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY WHITLEY SHANEL NEAL.

FILE: MEMO FROM D.A. ELECT/NOT

FILE: MEMO FROM D.A. ELECT/NOT RESPOND AT THIS TIM

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPENING BR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPENING BRIEF SERVED ON DISTRICT ATTY SERVED 06/27/12 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FI

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF RULING ON APPEAL.

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 08/21/12 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 08/21/12 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF RULING ON APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 08/17/12 RE: APPELLATE HEARING; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/23/12 (641911WN) (RIVERSIDE).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • FULLY BRIEFED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPENING BRIEF SERVED ON DISTRICT ATTY SERVED 06/27/12 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: MEMO FROM D.A. ELECT/NOT RESPOND AT THIS TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY WHITLEY SHANEL NEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 7/27/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: STOP NTC SENT RE ICORRECT COVER/P.O.S FOR AO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 7/02/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • RECEIVED: CERTIFIED RECORD OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • FILE: CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/23/12 (641911WN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • MORENO VALLEY JUDICIAL DISTRICT (641911WN).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC