This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 13:09:03 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. TIFFANY CORDOVA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2008 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TIFFANY CORDOVA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4443

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent and Defendant

TIFFANY CORDOVA

Other

RIVERSIDE SUPERIORCOURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

MARTINEZ, JOSEPH J.

4200 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Other Attorney

RIVERSIDE JUDICIALDISTRICT - CRIMINAL

4100 Main Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING N

FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

FILE: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF

FILE: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

FILE: REQUEST FOR CORRECTION O

FILE: REQUEST FOR CORRECTION OF THE RECORD

FILE: NTC OF FILING RECORD/APP

FILE: NTC OF FILING RECORD/APPEAL & FILING BRIEFS

FILE: REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO

FILE: REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF

FILE: MOTION TO STAY APPEAL PE

FILE: MOTION TO STAY APPEAL PENDING FINAL DECISION IN PEOPLE VS. WAGNER

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILE

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA.

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY TI

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY TIFFANY CORDOVA.

FILE: REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO

FILE: REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF

FILE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO

FILE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY APPEAL

FILE: MTN/STAY APPEAL PENDING

FILE: MTN/STAY APPEAL PENDING SUPREME CRT DECISION

ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL ON APPEA

ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL ON APPEAL FILED 09/18/2008 OF PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA FILED.

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 12/21/10 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 12/21/10 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 12/21/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL ON APPEAL FILED 09/18/2008 OF PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 10/22/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: MTN/STAY APPEAL PENDING SUPREME CRT DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE MOTION/STAY APPEAL PENDING SUPREME CRT DECISION.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 10/20/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 64

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NTC OF FILING RECORD/APPEAL & FILING BRIEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: REQUEST FOR CORRECTION OF THE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 1/27/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 62A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE REQUEST FOR CORRECTION OF THE RECORD.; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON APPEAL FILED 09/18/2008 OF PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA REMOVE ATTORNEY STEWART SACHS FOR PARTY(S) TIFFANY CORDOVA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JOSEPH J. MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • RIVERSIDE JUDICIAL DISTRICT (RIM514144).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • APPEAL FROM ORDER OF 08/19/08 (RIM514144)

    Read MoreRead Less