Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/18/2016 at 15:04:31 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. SHAUN E. SCHICK

Case Summary

On 04/27/2012 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SHAUN E SCHICK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0129

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

SHAUN EVERETT SCHICK

Other

BANNING COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

ALBERTO, MAE G.

5777 W. Century Blvd. #750

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Other Attorney

MT SAN JACINTO JUDICIAL DIST -CRIMINAL

311 E Ramsey St

Banning, CA 92220

 

Court Documents

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLA

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNS

ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON APPEAL AS TO SHAUN EVERETT SCHICK. MAE G. ALBERTO APPOINTED AS COUNSEL ON APPEAL; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APP

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILE

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY SHAUN EVERETT SCHICK.

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY PE

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FI

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INF

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INFRACTION/MISDEMEANOR]

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 03/11/13 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 03/11/13 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • PER CURIAM OPINION/JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INFRACTION/MISDEMEANOR]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 03/08/13 RE: APPELLATE HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 03/29/12 (BAM1100914) (RIVERSIDE).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • HEARING ON APPEAL (RIVERSIDE) SET 3/08/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 01A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • NO REPLY BRIEF FILED/ FULLY BRIEFED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 11/13/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPTAPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2012
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 10/29/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 9/28/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • RECEIVED: CERTIFIED RECORD OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • FILE: CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON APPEAL AS TO SHAUN EVERETT SCHICK. MAE G. ALBERTO APPOINTED AS COUNSEL ON APPEAL; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • BANNING JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BAM1100914).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 03/29/12 (BAM1100914)

    Read MoreRead Less