Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 09:49:57 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. RICARDO G. PAREDES

Case Summary

On 03/06/2006 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against RICARDO G PAREDES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3937

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

RICARDO G. PAREDES

Other

INDIO COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

BREAKEY, LISE M.

5750 Amaya Drive, #8

La Mesa, CA 91942

Other Attorney

DESERT JUDCIAL DISTRICT - CRIMINAL DIVISION

46-200 Oasis St

Indio, CA 92201

 

Court Documents

FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING N

FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NTC OF APPEAL

APPOINTED OF COUNSEL FOR APPEA

APPOINTED OF COUNSEL FOR APPEAL- GRANTED - ATTY LISE BREAKEY

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

FILE: APPELLANTS REQ EXT/TIME

FILE: APPELLANTS REQ EXT/TIME FILE OPENING BRIEF

NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S RIGHT TO

NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S RIGHT TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

FILE: REQ EXT/TIME FILE APPELL

FILE: REQ EXT/TIME FILE APPELLANTS SUPP BRIEF

FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION - JUD

FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION - JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 12/08/06 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 12/08/06 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION - JUDGMENT AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 12/08/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 62A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE COURTS RULING ON APPEAL.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/14/06 (INM162654).; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • APELLANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF DUE 08/24/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 7/24/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 62A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE REQ EXT/TIME FILE APPELLANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: REQ EXT/TIME FILE APPELLANTS SUPP BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • FILE: MEMO FROM DISTRICT ATTORNEYS RE WENDE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2006
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 6/05/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • HEARING ON APPEAL IS SET FOR 10/06/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 33A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2006
  • RECVD: CLERKS TRANCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2006
  • RECVD: NOTIFICATION FILING REPTRS TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • APPOINTED OF COUNSEL FOR APPEAL- GRANTED - ATTY LISE BREAKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NTC OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • INDIO JUDICIAL DISTRICT (INM162654).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/14/06 (INM162654)

    Read MoreRead Less