This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 09:56:31 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. MARK O. OKONKWO

Case Summary

On 03/13/2006 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MARK O OKONKWO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3949

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

MARK OKEOMA OKONKWO

Los Angeles, CA 90043

Other

MORENO VALLEY COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Other Attorney

MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC

13800 Heacock Ave Suite D201

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

 

Court Documents

FILE: NOTIFICATION FILING NOTI

FILE: NOTIFICATION FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

FILE: APPELLANTS REQUEST TO VA

FILE: APPELLANTS REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSAL

FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION-AFFIR

FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION-AFFIRMED

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 04/17/07 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 04/17/07 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION-AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • COURTS SUBSEQUENT RULING ON 03/02/07 @ 01:30 FOR DEPARTMENT 62A; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/21/06 (521390MO).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2007
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/21/06 (521390MO).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY MARK OKEOMA OKONKWO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 12/12/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: APPELLANTS REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/27/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 11/06/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 62A

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2006
  • ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • HEARING ON APPEAL IS SET FOR 1/05/07 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 62A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/04/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • RECVD: CLERKS TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2006
  • RECVD: NTC OF SETTLEMENT STMT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NOTIFICATION FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/21/06 (521390MO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • RIVERSIDE JUDICIAL DISTRICT (521390MO).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC