Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/18/2016 at 16:55:02 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. LOUISE A. TIDWELL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2012 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LOUISE A TIDWELL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0218

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Respondent

LOUISE A. TIDWELL

Other

INDIO COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KENNEDY, MICHAEL J

KENNEDY, MICHAEL J.

82632-B Hwy. 111, Ste. 3

Indio, CA 92201

Other Attorney

DESERT JUDCIAL DISTRICT - CRIMINAL DIVISION

46-200 Oasis St

Indio, CA 92201

 

Court Documents

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLA

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APP

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE T

REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE THE OPENING BRIEF BY APPELLANT FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER RE: REQ FOR EXT/TIME GRANTED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILE

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA.

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE RESP

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY LO

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY LOUISE A. TIDWELL.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FI

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INF

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INFRACTION/MISDEMEANOR]

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER RE: MTN CORR/JUDICIAL LIBEL IS DENIED.

FILE: MTN FOR CORR/JUDICIAL LI

FILE: MTN FOR CORR/JUDICIAL LIBEL IN CRTS OPINION

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 06/25/13 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 06/25/13 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: MTN FOR CORR/JUDICIAL LIBEL IN CRTS OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER RE: MTN CORR/JUDICIAL LIBEL IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 7/01/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT APP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE MTN FOR CORRECTION/JUDICIAL LIBEL IN COURTS OPINI.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INFRACTION/MISDEMEANOR]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • PER CURIAM OPINION/JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 06/14/13 RE: APPELLATE HEARING; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM ORDER GRANTING 1538.5 MTN 06/20/12 (INM1200212) (RIVERSIDE).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • HEARING ON APPEAL (RIVERSIDE) SET 6/14/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 01A.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 12/21/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • RECEIVED: CERTIFIED RECORD OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • FILE: CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • INDIO JUDICIAL DISTRICT (INM1200212).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • APPEAL FROM ORDER GRANTING 1538.5 MTN (INM1200212)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON LOUISE A. TIDWELL FROM MICHAEL J KENNEDY TO MICHAEL J. KENNEDY ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less