This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 21:14:18 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. LAURENCE YOUNG

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LAURENCE YOUNG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

LAURENCE ALLGRIM YOUNG

Westminster, CA 92683

Other

MORENO VALLEY COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Other Attorney

MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC

13800 Heacock Ave Suite D201

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

 

Court Documents

Remittitur issued by Appellate Department has now become final from Decision or Order of November 23, 2020,

12/28/2020: Remittitur issued by Appellate Department has now become final from Decision or Order of November 23, 2020,

Certificate of Mailing

11/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted (Appellate)

11/23/2020: Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted (Appellate)

Ruling of submitted appeal

11/23/2020: Ruling of submitted appeal

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on Appeal from the judgment on 12/12/19 (RH177729LY) (Indio).

10/30/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on Appeal from the judgment on 12/12/19 (RH177729LY) (Indio).

Notice of Hearing on Appeal.

09/23/2020: Notice of Hearing on Appeal.

File: Memorandum from D.A. electing not to respond at this time.

06/02/2020: File: Memorandum from D.A. electing not to respond at this time.

Appellant's Opening Brief filed by LAURENCE ALLGRIM YOUNG.

06/02/2020: Appellant's Opening Brief filed by LAURENCE ALLGRIM YOUNG.

Notice of Filing Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule.

02/20/2020: Notice of Filing Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule.

Notification of Filing Appellate Case.

01/07/2020: Notification of Filing Appellate Case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Remittitur issued by Appellate Department has now become final from Decision or Order of November 23, 2020,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingType: Ruling on Matter Submitted (Appellate); Location/Courtroom: Appeals; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted (Appellate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ruling of submitted appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing on Appeal from the judgment on 12/12/19 (RH177729LY) (Indio).; Location/Courtroom: Department 3T; Disposition: Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on Appeal from the judgment on 12/12/19 (RH177729LY) (Indio).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Hearing on Appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: No respondent's brief / FULLY BRIEFED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: File: Memorandum from D.A. electing not to respond at this time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Appellant's Opening Brief filed by LAURENCE ALLGRIM YOUNG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Filing Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: File: Certified Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notification of Filing Appellate Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketFilings: Appeal of Judgment (Infraction) of LAURENCE ALLGRIM YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC