This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/13/2017 at 09:47:34 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. KRISTIE K. WILLIS

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 PEOPLE filed an Other lawsuit against KRISTIE K WILLIS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Hall Of Justice located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0056

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

KRISTIE KAYE WILLIS

Riverside, CA 92501

Other

RIVERSIDE SUPERIORCOURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

DISTRICT ATTORNEY RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

OJO, GEOFFREY

5777 W. Century Blvd. Suite 750

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Other Attorney

RIVERSIDE JUDICIALDISTRICT - CRIMINAL

4100 Main Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

FILE: REQUEST FOR COURT-APPOIN

FILE: REQUEST FOR COURT-APPOINTED LAWYER

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLA

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNS

ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON APPEAL AS TO KRISTIE KAYE WILLIS. GEOFFREY OJO APPOINTED AS COUNSEL ON APPEAL; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER RE: REQ/FOR COURT APPT.LAWYER GRANTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MOTION TO AUGMENT RECORD GRANTED.

FILE: MOTION TO AUGMENT THE RE

FILE: MOTION TO AUGMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APP

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE APPE

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED.

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILE

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY KRISTIE KAYE WILLIS.

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY PE

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA.

APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED

APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED BY KRISTIE KAYE WILLIS.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FI

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INF

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INFRACTION/MISDEMEANOR]

FILE: AMENDED PER CURIAM OPINI

FILE: AMENDED PER CURIAM OPINION

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 02/19/14 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 02/19/14 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: AMENDED PER CURIAM OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 02/14/14 RE: APPELLATE HEARING; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • PER CURIAM OPINION/JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM OPINION FILED. [INFRACTION/MISDEMEANOR]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/22/13 (RIM1211394) (RIVERSIDE).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • HEARING ON APPEAL (RIVERSIDE) SET 2/14/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 01A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • FULLY BRIEFED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED BY KRISTIE KAYE WILLIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2013
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE MOTION TO AUGMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER RE: REQ/FOR COURT APPT.LAWYER GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ON APPEAL AS TO KRISTIE KAYE WILLIS. GEOFFREY OJO APPOINTED AS COUNSEL ON APPEAL; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 4/04/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT APP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE REQUEST FOR COURT-APPOINTED LAWYER.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: REQUEST FOR COURT-APPOINTED LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • RIVERSIDE JUDICIAL DISTRICT (RIM1211394).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 02/22/13 (RIM1211394)

    Read MoreRead Less