This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 20:22:03 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. JONATHAN HAZELTON

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONATHAN HAZELTON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0023

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

JONATHAN KENT HAZELTON

Moreno Valley, CA 92557

Other

MORENO VALLEY COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Other Attorney

MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC

13800 Heacock Ave Suite D201

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

 

Court Documents

Remittitur issued by Appellate Department (Decision or Order of 9/29/20 has now become final. NO costs on appeal)

11/04/2020: Remittitur issued by Appellate Department (Decision or Order of 9/29/20 has now become final. NO costs on appeal)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order.

09/29/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order.

Legacy Minute Order: Order re Dismissal of Appeal

09/29/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Order re Dismissal of Appeal

Notice of failure to file appellant's opening brief.

07/31/2020: Notice of failure to file appellant's opening brief.

Notice of Filing Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule.

06/30/2020: Notice of Filing Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule.

Notification of Filing Appellate Case.

02/05/2020: Notification of Filing Appellate Case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Remittitur issued by Appellate Department (Decision or Order of 9/29/20 has now become final. NO costs on appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingType: Order re Dismissal of Appeal; Location/Courtroom: Clerk's Calendar Appeals; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Order re Dismissal of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of failure to file appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Filing Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: File: Certified Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notification of Filing Appellate Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketFilings: Appeal of Judgment (Infraction) of JONATHAN KENT HAZELTON; Disposition: Complete 11/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC