This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 08:12:17 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS. GERMAN ROMERO

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GERMAN ROMERO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0142

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Appellant and Defendant

GERMAN S ROMERO

Riverside, CA 92507

Other

MORENO VALLEY COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Other Attorney

MORENO VALLEY BRANCH - TRAFFIC

13800 Heacock Ave Suite D201

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 11/08/19 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER.

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE APPE

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APP

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE.

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLA

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 11/08/19 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAPPEAL STAGE AT DISPOSITION - BEFORE HEARING (CIVIL JBSIS - APPELLATE DIVISION REPORT 04B).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketORDER RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketORDER RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL IS SET FOR 11/08/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 11/05/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 10/10/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketFILE: CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMORENO VALLEY JUDICIAL DISTRICT (HN41928GR).

    Read MoreRead Less