This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 09:05:54 (UTC).

PEOPLE V. ANDREW LEE OLIVAREZ

Case Summary

On 08/08/2005 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ANDREW LEE OLIVAREZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3828

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Appellant

ANDREW LEE OLIVAREZ

Other

RIVERSIDE COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

3960 Orange St 1St Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH E ROWLAND

17592 Irvine Blvd Ste 204

Tustin, CA 92780

Other Attorney

RIVERSIDE JUDICIALDISTRICT - CRIMINAL

4100 Main Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 08/04/06 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

FILE: MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

FILE: MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT-DENIED-PM

PEOPLES MOTION TO DISMISS - GR

PEOPLES MOTION TO DISMISS - GRANTED - PM

NOTICE OF HEARING PEOPLES MOTI

NOTICE OF HEARING PEOPLES MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

FILED: MOTION TO VACATE ORDER

FILED: MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HEARING.

FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING N

FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL RIM437048

APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 10/15/

APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 10/15/04

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 08/04/06 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. NO COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT-DENIED-PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 9/20/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 62A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PEOPLES MOTION TO DISMISS - GRANTED - PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL FILED 08/08/2005 OF ANDREW OLIVAREZ BY PEOPLE OF THE STATEOF CALIFORNIA; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING PEOPLES MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2006
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS SET 8/04/06 AT 13:30 IN DEPARTMENT 33A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • RECVD: DEFENDANTS PROPOSED STATEMENT ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2005
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE REQUEST TO VACATE ORDER OF DISMISSAL.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 12/19/05 AT 13:30 IN DEPT 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2005
  • HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF APPEAL PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 190; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • HEARING IS SET ON 12/02/05 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL RIM437048

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • RIVERSIDE JUDICIAL DISTRICT (RIM437048).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 10/15/04

    Read MoreRead Less